THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 3:53:16 AM
Guerra Paez, Jose Guillermo
CPSO#:
60393
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 495-2600
Fax: 416-3351719
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:07 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOSE GUILLERMO GUERRA PAEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUERRA PAEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 1988 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jan 2006 |