THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 6:12:52 AM
Snider, Donald David
CPSO#:
52670
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 May 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 May 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
716 Dundas St., Unit B
Woodstock ON N4S 1E7
Phone: (519) 533-0865
Fax: (519) 533-0947
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David Snider Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD DAVID SNIDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SNIDER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 May 1990 |