THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:31:23 AM
Wong, Min Min Chi
CPSO#:
52040
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Apr 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Humber College Boulevard
Suite 716
Toronto ON M9V 0A9
Phone: (416) 740-9663
Fax: (416) 740-0827
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:11 Sep 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIN MIN CHI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1988 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Apr 1988 |