THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:40:51 AM
Butchey, Janki
CPSO#:
50323
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Dec 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Butchey and Dr. Janki Butchey Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:68 Birchmount Walk
London, ON N6K 3X4
Date Received: 22 Apr 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:18 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1986 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1986 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1988 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2020 |