THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 23:34:02 PM
Nichols, Bruce David
CPSO#:
33187
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Laser Vision London
1695 Wonderland Road North
London ON N6G 4W3
Phone: 519-204-0450
Fax: 519-204-0451
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Colorado
USA - Minnesota
USA - Utah
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:19 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRUCE DAVID NICHOLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1987 |