THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 3:01:56 AM
Caco, Christopher Carl
CPSO#:
32915
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Feb 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Feb 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson St
Hamilton ON L8R 1E2
Phone: (905) 526-9744
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:21 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CARL CACO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CACO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 1985 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 1986 |