THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 22:31:43 PM
Pendharkar, Sushama
CPSO#:
32765
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Nagpur University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1641 Covington Terr
Mississauga ON L5M 3S4
Phone: 9058263940
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 May 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUSHAMA PENDHARKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PENDHARKAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1981 |