THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 23:18:45 PM
Rebot, Morris Ted Miroslaw
CPSO#:
32476
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Dec 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. MTM Rebot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 13 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Michael J. Weinberg, 247 Queensway West, Mississauga ON L5B 1B9
Tel: (905) 273-3045
Date Received: 11 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2022 |