THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:43:06 AM
Esmond, Elizabeth Mary
CPSO#:
32373
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 May 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 May 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
407-1919 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 1A2
Phone: 613-889-8388
Fax: 613-731-2248
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. E.M. Esmond Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MARY ESMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESMOND is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 May 1981 |