THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:46:03 AM
Tarlton, Rebecca Susan
CPSO#:
32226
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Jan 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Other - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Clinical Immunology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jan 1984 |