THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:35:13 PM
Lossing, Alan Glenn
CPSO#:
32134
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
320 - 535 Mullock Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 953-8787
Fax: (905) 953-0330
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Lossing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:16 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN GLENN LOSSING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSSING is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1983 |