THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:37:58 AM
Goodwin, Susan Earleene
CPSO#:
32016
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fawcett, Susan Earleene (used until: 03 Jun 2003 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:749 Montgomery Drive
Ancaster, Ontario
L9G 3H6
Date Received: 01 Jun 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:29 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 23 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 14 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 12 Aug 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Susan Earleene Goodwin to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 12, 2019. See attached PDF:
Download Full Document (PDF)