THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:40:27 AM
Hamdy, Hazem Ali
CPSO#:
31986
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 May 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hazem A. Hamdy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Contact above by phone, email or their website
Records Management Ltd.,
13 - 1 High Meadow Pl
Tornoto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1.800.775.0093
Fax: 647.933.2904
[email protected]
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 22 Dec 2016
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: May 27, 2009
Expiry Date:
Summary:
NOTICE OF RESTRICTION OF PRIVILEGES:
On June 26, 2009, Ottawa Hospital notified the College that Dr. Hazem Ali Hamdy's privileges were restricted, effective May 27, 2009.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1980 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2010 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2010 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 13 Jan 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2016 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Oct 2010
Summary:
On October 13, 2010, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Hamdy's admission and found that he committed an act of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in respect of his sterilization techniques and sterilization of his operating environment.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. Dr. Hamdy appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
2. The Registrar to suspend Dr. Hamdy's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months commencing from the date of this Order.
3. The Registrar impose the following specified terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Hamdy's certificate of registration for an indefinite period or for the specified period of times set out herein:
(a) Dr. Hamdy shall not perform circumcisions and shall post a sign, in the form attached as Appendix "A", in a prominent place in the waiting room and in the examination/procedure rooms in his office.
(b) Dr. Hamdy shall use sterile procedures at all times in his office.
(c) At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall engage in monthly supervision of infection control practices and procedures by a supervisor who has been approved by the College and who has executed an undertaking in the form attached as Appendix "B", for a period of two (2) years from the date of this Order.
(d) At his own expense, Dr Hamdy shall ensure that a member of a regulated health profession, who has been approved by the College and who has executed an undertaking in the form attached as Appendix "C", be present for all intra-articular injections and office surgical procedures that cause a break in the skin for a period of one (1) year from the date of this Order.
(e) At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall successfully complete, within approximately 18 months, education programs acceptable to the College in:
(i) Record-Keeping;
(ii) Ethics; and
(iii) Communications and Informed Consent;
and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion of the College approved education programs as set out above in paragraphs 4(e)(i)-(iii).
(f) At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall successfully complete, within approximately 6 months, an education program acceptable to the College in:
(i) Infection Control
and shall provide proof to the College of his successful completion of the College approved education program.
(g) At his own expense, Dr. Hamdy shall undergo a reassessment of his practice in approximately one (1) year from date of the Order.
(h) Dr. Hamdy shall cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice and patient charts by a College representative(s) for the purpose of monitoring and enforcing his compliance with the terms of this Order.
4. Dr. Hamdy pay to the College costs in the amount of $3650 within 30 days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): October 13, 2010