THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:35:53 AM
Durie, Peter Roy
CPSO#:
31981
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
14 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Sep 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Swahili
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2014 |