THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:34:19 PM
Coles, John Gordon
CPSO#:
31974
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6204
Fax: (416) 813-7984
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Coles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 25 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:09 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Oct 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1984 |