THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:39:40 AM
Nawaz, Ahmad
CPSO#:
31963
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
13 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Sep 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6, 1-(888)563-3732
Date Received: 13 Aug 2015
Instructions/Address:
Record Storage and Retrieval Services Incorporated
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Telephone: (416)-398-0638
Fax: (416)-342-1052
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 23 Oct 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1980 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2015 |