THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:14:45 AM
Wat, Patrick Cheuk Wing
CPSO#:
31902
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-Nov-2019
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Patrick Wat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:111 St Regis Cres S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
or
www.rsrs.com or 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 24 Jan 2019
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record can contact RSRS at 1-888-563-3732.
Date Received: 30 Nov 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Jul 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jan 2019 |