THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:00:05 AM
Suh, Matthew Chung Kuee
CPSO#:
31835
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Seoul National University, 1957
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Nov 1964 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1967 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: July 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Matthew Chung Kuee Suh to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 6, 2018:
Dr. Suh was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and sexual abuse with respect to one patient. After the allegations were referred to the Discipline Committee and prior to the hearing, Dr. Suh resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)