THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 6:00:06 AM
Osborn, David Douglas
CPSO#:
31698
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 May 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2013 |