THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 5:56:15 AM
Ingram, Diana Ruth
CPSO#:
31614
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Aug 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:13 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Sep 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2004 |