THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:03:59 AM
Brown, Peter Joseph Irvin
CPSO#:
31440
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 1980
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 May 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UNUM
1 Fountain Square
Chattanooga TN 37402
United States
Phone: (423) 294-8016
Fax: (416) 813-6461
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Tennessee
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER JOSEPH IRVIN BROWN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Apr 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 1980 |