THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:40:54 AM
Reyes, Celia Ang
CPSO#:
31277
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ste 300-301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON M4S 3C3
Phone: 416 486 8088
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:09 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CELIA ANG REYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REYES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 23 Jul 1973 to 15 Jun 1974
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 1980 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 27 Feb 1981 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Dec 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 08 Feb 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 May 2007 |