THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 20:51:30 PM
Baeta, Basil Roderick
CPSO#:
31233
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records storage facility: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 17 Dec 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:10 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |