THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:41:45 PM
Niznick, Joel Marvin
CPSO#:
31199
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
08 Apr 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
8-Apr-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Joel Niznick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:05 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1983 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 08 Apr 2022 |