THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:09:41 PM
Rinn, Richard William
CPSO#:
31117
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Laboratories
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |