THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 5:51:06 AM
Derenda, Yolanda
CPSO#:
31109
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
11 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Mar 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Fulgosi, Yolanda (used until: 28 Mar 1982 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English, Italian
Education: University of Zagreb, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1978 to 01 Sep 1978
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2001 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee |
Effective: 09 Jun 2006 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 11 Feb 2008 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Nov 2007
Summary:
On November 27, 2007, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Derenda committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, and under paragraph 1(1)1 of O. Reg. 856/93 in that she has contravened a term, condition or limitation on her certificate of registration.
The Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On February 11, 2008, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. The Registrar revoked Dr. Derenda's certificate of registration, effective immediately.
2. Dr. Derenda pay costs to the College in the amount of $12,215.24 within 90 days of the date of this Order.
3. The results of this proceeding be included on the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 27, 2007
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 08 Mar 2001
Summary:
On March 8, 2001, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Derenda to be incapacitated and ordered the following:
1. That the Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Derenda(s certificate of registration:
(a) Dr. Derenda may not practice unless and until:
(i) Dr. Derenda is monitored by a member holding a certificate of practice in Ontario who is acceptable to the Registrar, which member has executed and is in compliance with an acknowledgement and undertaking in a form agreeable to the Registrar and has delivered such acknowledgement and undertaking to the College within thirty (30) days of the date it is agreed upon by the Registrar. Should any person who has executed an acknowledgement and undertaking for Dr. Derenda pursuant to this order be unable or unwilling to continue under the terms of the acknowledgement and undertaking, Dr. Derenda will provide, within thirty (30) days, a fresh acknowledgement and undertaking from a further person who is satisfactory to the Registrar in a form satisfactory to the Registrar;
(ii) Dr. Derenda obtain a satisfactory result on a peer assessment on a bi-annual basis; and
(iii) Dr. Derenda participate in ongoing psychiatric treatment by a psychiatrist certified by the Royal College as frequently as recommended by the psychiatrist and until such time as the psychiatrist advises the Registrar that such treatment is no longer required.
2. That the Registrar to immediately suspend Dr. Derenda(s certificate of registration in the event that Dr. Derenda fails to comply with any provision of this order, until such time as Dr. Derenda is in compliance with this order.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Mar 2001