THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 4:02:53 AM
Landry, Jacques
CPSO#:
31087
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
22 Jan 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:05 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 22 Jan 1998 |