THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:28:28 AM
Jambrosic, Jadranka Adriana
CPSO#:
31073
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
115 Midair Ct
Dynacare Home Office
Brampton ON L6T 5M3
Phone: 905 790 3515 Ext. 5399
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JADRANKA ADRIANA JAMBROSIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMBROSIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1977 to 12 Jun 1978
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 16 Sep 1978
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1979 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Sep 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Aug 1979 |