THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 19:50:28 PM
Fedoruk, James Curtis
CPSO#:
30932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
104-11811 Tecumseh Rd E
Tecumseh Walk In Clinic
Tecumseh ON N8N 4M7
Phone: 519 979-3355
Fax: 519 979-1429
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Nov 1985 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES CURTIS FEDORUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEDORUK is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2019 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2021 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 5, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: August 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)