THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:35:58 PM
Lerman, Jerrold
CPSO#:
30903
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 1983
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
John R. Oishei Children's Hospital
1001 Main St, Suite K-3502
Buffalo NY 14203
United States
Phone: (716) 323-6570
Fax: (716) 323-6658
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:10 Jun 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JERROLD LERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LERMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1983 |