THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
17/04/24 23:12:47 PM
Bozyk, Kevin Stanley
CPSO#:
30901
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
24 Jun 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Nov 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2013 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |