THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:12:24 AM
Shum, Andrew Sai-Chak
CPSO#:
30623
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
11 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jul 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Fax: 416-398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1979 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 2012 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 11 Sep 2013 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Sep 2013
Summary:
On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shum committed and act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Shum is incompetent. Dr. Shum admitted the allegations.
Dr. Shum's infection control procedures and his maintenance of equipment in performing urologic procedures did not meet the standard of practice of the profession. He displayed a lack of both judgment and knowledge regarding what is required to safely practice invasive procedures in the ambulatory care setting. His multiple reprocessing and practice breaches put patients at risk of bacterial and viral cross colonization or infections.
Multiple deficiencies were identified in Dr. Shum's urologic practice, including with respect to prostate biopsy and cystoscopy, prostate cancer care, microscopic hematuria evaluation, and management of urethral stenosis including urethral dilatation. Dr. Shum failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his family practice with respect to record keeping and displayed a lack of knowledge with respect to various type of preventative screening. Dr. Shum's practice exposed patients to potential risk of harm.
On September 19, 2012, the Inquires, Complaints and Reports Committee ordered and directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Shum's certificate of registration, without notice, under s. 37(6) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. He has not practised medicine since that date.
The Committee ordered and directed that:
( the Registrar revoke Dr. Shum's certificate of registration, effective immediately.
( Dr. Shum attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Shum pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 11, 2013 1:00 p.m.