THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 20:47:41 PM
Le Riche, Nicole Georgina Harding
CPSO#:
30491
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Nov 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John M. Howard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 8 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Command Services Limited
Records Management
100 Picadilly Street
London ON N6A 1R8
Phone: 519-672-1460
Date Received: 20 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:06 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2015 |