THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 4:09:50 AM
Harding, Lorin Gilbert
CPSO#:
30345
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Jul 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 1978 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 19 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 08 May 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 31, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lorin Gilbert Harding to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 31, 2018:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Harding failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his infection control practices. During the investigation, Dr. Harding resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)