THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:42:12 AM
Leith, Eric Stephen
CPSO#:
30307
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Aug 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1011 Upper Middle Road East
Upper Level
MCI The Doctor's Office
Oakville ON L6H4L1
Phone: 9058497007
Fax: 9058497883
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:06 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC STEPHEN LEITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEITH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1978 |