THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:41:34 AM
Zhuk, Arkadii Abraham
CPSO#:
30285
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Nov 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
26 Jul 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Latvian, Polish, Portuguese, Russian, Ukrainian, Yiddish
Education: Latvian State University, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2003 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Jan 2003
Summary:
On January 16, 2003, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Zhuk(s plea of no contest and found him guilty of professional misconduct with respect to disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional conduct and ordered the following:
1) That Dr. Zhuk attend before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.
2) The Registrar shall be directed to suspend Dr. Zhuk(s certificate of registration for a period of (3) three months. The suspension shall itself be suspended provided Dr. Zhuk successfully completes, at his own expense, an ethics course approved by the College to the satisfaction of the Registrar within a period of (12) twelve months from the date of the order; and makes the cost payment in paragraph 3 of this order wihin 60 days of the date of the order, and otherwise to impose the suspension on January 16, 2004.
3) The Discipline Committee orders that Dr. Zhuk pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within 60 days of the order.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 13, 2003