THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:01:07 PM
Marshall, John Christopher
CPSO#:
30263
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Bond Wing 4-007
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5225
Fax: (416) 864-5141
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Christopher Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CHRISTOPHER MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jun 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 May 1981 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1990 |