THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:33:50 AM
Fantus, Ivan George
CPSO#:
30072
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McGill University Health Centre
Royal Victoria Hospital
C04.4190 - 1001 Boul Decarie
Montreal QC H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 843-1659
Fax: 514938-7704
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Ivan George Fantus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients requiring a copy of their medical records should call the number above.
Records Management Ltd
Phone: 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 06 Jul 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IVAN GEORGE FANTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FANTUS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1978 |