THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:22:43 AM
Hanna, Wedad Morcas
CPSO#:
29791
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2181 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4S 3H7
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Wedad Hanna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:23 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WEDAD MORCAS HANNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANNA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1978 |