THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:18:53 PM
Blundell, Ross Stephen
CPSO#:
29637
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Sep 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St Michaels Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 31 Mar 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2016 |