THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:42:50 AM
Merchea, Man Mohan
CPSO#:
29616
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Sep 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Vikram University, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
110-230 First Ave
St Thomas ON N5R 4P5
Phone: 519-633-9846
Fax: 519-637-8321
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Mohan Merchea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:18 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAN MOHAN MERCHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MERCHEA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1977 |