THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:02:02 AM
Vilis, Donna Mary
CPSO#:
29546
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Aug 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Box 160
Pakenham ON K0A 2X0
Phone: (613) 624-5480
Fax: (613) 624-5223
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Vilis Kiskis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2021 |