THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 2:20:01 AM
Crummey, James Macdonald
CPSO#:
29505
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
06 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Not In Practice
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.M. Crummey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 10 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Matthew Narine, Mount Dennis Weston Health Center, 2050 Weston Road, Toronto M9N 1X4
Date Received: 05 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1978 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 May 2022 |