THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:13:07 AM
Swart, Greta Toni
CPSO#:
29438
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jul 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Swart's medical records will remain with:
C P R I
600 Sanatorium Road
London, ON
N6H 3W7
Tel: (519) 858-2774
Date Received: 30 Apr 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2013 |