THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 13:20:56 PM
Simor, Andrew Eugene
CPSO#:
29360
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Room B103
Department Of Microbiology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4549
Fax: (416) 480-6990
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:06 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:14 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW EUGENE SIMOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMOR is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 1984 |