THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 18:51:39 PM
Paulseth, John Erik
CPSO#:
29218
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. John Erik Paulseth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd. 1.800.775.0093
[email protected]
1 High Meadow Pl, UNit 13
Toronto, ON
M9L 0A3
Date Received: 29 Jun 2020
Instructions/Address:Contact above
Records Management Ltd.
1.800.775.0093
[email protected]
1 High Meadow Pl, UNit 13, Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 21 Feb 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:08 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |