THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 3:20:08 AM
Tsuchida, William Shigeru
CPSO#:
29201
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. William Tsuchida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 7 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may contact Dr. Hadipour Jahromi via telephone at: 519-759-6116, or submit a request in writing to the following address: North Woodlands Medical Centre, 40 Shellington Place, Suite 204, Brantford, ON N3S 0C5.
Date Received: 06 Nov 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2021 |