THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 4:56:46 AM
Eddy, Allison Audrey
CPSO#:
29047
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Dec 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Apr 2023 |