THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 12:22:15 PM
Pearson, Brooke Edward
CPSO#:
29044
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Dec 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Feb 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
379 St Paul Avenue
Brantford ON N3R 4N5
Phone: (519) 512-0030
Fax: (519) 512-0051
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BROOKE EDWARD PEARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEARSON is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Feb 1979 |