THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 4:07:14 AM
Goldenberg, Leslie Mark Cooper
CPSO#:
28995
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Mar 1977
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Walking Mobility Clinics
Unit 9
1084 Salk Road
Pickering ON L1W 4B6
Phone: (905) 420-1015
Fax: (905) 420-8803
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Leslie M. Goldenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LESLIE MARK COOPER GOLDENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDENBERG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 1977 |